DC B23-0922 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-08 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-922 provides additional protections for trees located on public space to expand the District’s tree canopy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Tree Protection and Canopy Expansion Amendment Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-08CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-11-20CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-11-16CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-10-06CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2020-10-02CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0922 Published in the DC Register
2020-09-24CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback