DC B23-0910 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-23 - Act A23-0417 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12252, Expires on Jan 11, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-23 - Act A23-0417 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12252, Expires on Jan 11, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Arts and Humanities Capital Funding Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Arts and Humanities Capital Funding Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-23 | Council | Act A23-0417 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12252, Expires on Jan 11, 2021 |
2020-10-15 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-10-14 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0417, Expires on Jan 11, 2021 |
2020-10-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-09-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 14, 2020 |
2020-09-22 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-09-21 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |