DC B23-0864 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-21 - Act A23-0382 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9865, Expires on Nov 10, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-21 - Act A23-0382 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9865, Expires on Nov 10, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Open Polling Places Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Open Polling Places Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-21 | Council | Act A23-0382 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9865, Expires on Nov 10, 2020 |
2020-08-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-08-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0382, Expires on Nov 10, 2020 |
2020-08-03 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 17, 2020 |
2020-07-28 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-07-28 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen) |
2020-07-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-07-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |