DC B23-0847 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-14 - Act A23-0360 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9668, Expires on Nov 02, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-14 - Act A23-0360 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9668, Expires on Nov 02, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
New Hospital at St Elizabeths Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Title
New Hospital at St Elizabeths Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-14 | Council | Act A23-0360 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9668, Expires on Nov 02, 2020 |
2020-08-10 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-08-05 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0360, Expires on Nov 02, 2020 |
2020-07-30 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 13, 2020 |
2020-07-21 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-07-21 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-07-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |