DC B23-0841 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-21 - Act A23-0374 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9849, Expires on Nov 10, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-21 - Act A23-0374 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9849, Expires on Nov 10, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Fiscal Year 2021 Capital Funding Agreement Emergency Act of 2020
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Fiscal Year 2021 Capital Funding Agreement Emergency Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-21 | Council | Act A23-0374 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9849, Expires on Nov 10, 2020 |
2020-08-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-08-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0374, Expires on Nov 10, 2020 |
2020-08-03 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 17, 2020 |
2020-07-21 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-07-21 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-07-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |