DC B23-0840 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-15 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-15 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-840 designates the park located at the 6100 block of North Dakota Ave, N.W., between Quackenbos St, N.W. and 2 St, N.W., as the Ronald ‘Ron’ Austin Memorial Park.
Title
Ronald "Ron" Austin Memorial Park Designation Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-08-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2020-07-17 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0840 Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0840 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/45372/Introduction/B23-0840-Introduction.pdf |