DC B23-0836 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-836 permits DC Water to replace a lead water service line on private property where they are replacing the portion on public property. No homeowner consent is necessary to complete a replacement on public property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lead Service Line Replacement Amendment Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-30CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-07-21CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2020-07-10CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-07-10CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0836 Published in the DC Register
2020-07-07CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-07-06CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback