DC B23-0827 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-21 - Agendized; not considered at the request of T. White
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-21 - Agendized; not considered at the request of T. White
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stormiyah Denson-Jackson Race and Gender Economic Damages Equality Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Stormiyah Denson-Jackson Race and Gender Economic Damages Equality Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Council | Agendized; not considered at the request of T. White |
2020-07-21 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-07-07 | Council | Postponed to July 21, 2020 |
2020-07-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0827 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/45310/Introduction/B23-0827-Introduction.pdf |