DC B23-0826 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-18 - Law L23-0151, Effective from Dec 03, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14603, Expires on Jul 15, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Comprehensive Policing and Justice Reform Second Temporary Amendment Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Comprehensive Policing and Justice Reform Second Temporary Amendment Act of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-21 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-18CouncilLaw L23-0151, Effective from Dec 03, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14603, Expires on Jul 15, 2021
2020-09-03CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2020-08-21CouncilAct A23-0399 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9920
2020-08-14CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-08-12CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0399
2020-07-30CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 13, 2020
2020-07-21CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-07-21CouncilRetained by the Council
2020-07-10CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0826 Published in the DC Register
2020-07-07CouncilFirst Reading
2020-07-06CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback