DC B23-0816 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-31 - Act A23-0335 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9146, Expires on Oct 19, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-31 - Act A23-0335 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9146, Expires on Oct 19, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Health Emergency Authority Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Public Health Emergency Authority Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-31 | Council | Act A23-0335 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9146, Expires on Oct 19, 2020 |
2020-07-27 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-07-22 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0335, Expires on Oct 19, 2020 |
2020-07-14 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 28, 2020 |
2020-07-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-07-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-07-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |