DC B23-0788 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0582 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001137
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0582 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001137
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-788 orders the dedication of Lot 252 in Square 620 for the widening of First Street, NW, right of way and authorizes the improvement of the dedicated land for street purposes in Ward 6.
Title
Dedication of Lot 252 in Square 620 for the First Street, NW, Right-of-Way, S.O. 19-48848 Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-10 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-11-10 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0582 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001137 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0582 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-10 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-11-10 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0788 |
2020-10-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-09-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-06-19 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0788 Published in the DC Register |
2020-06-16 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |