DC B23-0785 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-07 - Act A23-0337 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9348, Expires on Oct 24, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-07 - Act A23-0337 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9348, Expires on Oct 24, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Black Lives Matter Plaza Designation Emergency Act of 2020
Title
Black Lives Matter Plaza Designation Emergency Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-07 | Council | Act A23-0337 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9348, Expires on Oct 24, 2020 |
2020-07-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-07-27 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0337, Expires on Oct 24, 2020 |
2020-07-14 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 28, 2020 |
2020-07-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-06-16 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-06-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |