DC B23-0777 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-13 - Law L23-0138, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13203
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-13 - Law L23-0138, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13203
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
New Hospital at St. Elizabeths Act of 2020
Title
New Hospital at St. Elizabeths Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 2 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 2 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-13 | Council | Law L23-0138, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13203 |
2020-09-03 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-08-14 | Council | Act A23-0350 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9635 |
2020-08-10 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-08-05 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0350 |
2020-07-30 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 13, 2020 |
2020-07-21 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-07-21 | Council | Amendment (Silverman) |
2020-07-07 | Council | First Reading |
2020-07-01 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-07-01 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0777 |
2020-06-30 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-06-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-06-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-06-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-06-12 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0777 Published in the DC Register |
2020-06-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-06-09 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2020-06-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |