DC B23-0772 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-17 - Act A23-0331 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8607, Expires on Oct 04, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-17 - Act A23-0331 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8607, Expires on Oct 04, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Connected Transportation Network Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Connected Transportation Network Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - Council - Amendment #1 (T.White) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Council - Amendment #1 (T.White) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Council | Act A23-0331 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8607, Expires on Oct 04, 2020 |
2020-07-08 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-07-07 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0331, Expires on Oct 04, 2020 |
2020-06-30 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-06-22 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 7, 2020 |
2020-06-09 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-06-09 | Council | Amendment #2 (T.White) - Not considered |
2020-06-09 | Council | Amendment #1 (T.White) |
2020-06-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |