DC B23-0761 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-13 - Law L23-0136, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13201
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-13 - Law L23-0136, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13201
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2021 Local Budget Act of 2020
Title
Fiscal Year 2021 Local Budget Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - Council - Amendment (T. White) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - Council - Amendment (Grosso and T. White) (Y: 2 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - Motion to Postpone (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - Motion to Close Debate (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Council - Motion to Postpone to July 23, 2020 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Council - Motion to Close Debate (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - Council - Amendment (T. White) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - Council - Amendment (Grosso and T. White) (Y: 2 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - Motion to Postpone (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - Motion to Close Debate (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Council - Motion to Postpone to July 23, 2020 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Council - Motion to Close Debate (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-13 | Council | Law L23-0136, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13201 |
2020-11-05 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-05 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-09-04 | Council | Act A23-0408 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 10629 |
2020-09-03 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-08-31 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-08-31 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0408 |
2020-08-17 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 31, 2020 |
2020-07-23 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-07-23 | Council | Amendment (T. White) |
2020-07-23 | Council | Amendment (Grosso and T. White) |
2020-07-23 | Council | Amendment (Allen) |
2020-07-23 | Council | Agendized; not considered at the request of Silverman |
2020-07-23 | Council | Agendized; not considered at the request of Silverman |
2020-07-23 | Council | Amendment (Nadeau) |
2020-07-23 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2020-07-23 | Council | Agendized; not considered at the request of Mendelson |
2020-07-21 | Council | Motion to Postpone |
2020-07-21 | Council | Motion to Close Debate |
2020-07-21 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2020-07-21 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) |
2020-07-07 | Council | First Reading |
2020-07-07 | Council | Amendment (Allen #2) - Amended Orally |
2020-07-07 | Council | Amendment (Allen #1) - Not Considered |
2020-07-07 | Council | Amendment (Nadeau and Silverman) |
2020-07-07 | Council | Amendment (T. White) |
2020-07-07 | Council | Amendment (R. White) |
2020-07-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0761 |
2020-06-25 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0761 |
2020-06-25 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0761 |
2020-06-25 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0761 |
2020-06-24 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0761 |
2020-06-24 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0761 |
2020-06-23 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0761 |
2020-06-23 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0761 |
2020-06-09 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2020-05-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0761 Published in the DC Register |
2020-05-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |