DC B23-0757 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Coronavirus Support Emergency Amendment Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coronavirus Support Emergency Amendment Act of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-19 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-19 - Council - Oral Amendments (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-19 - Council - Oral Amendment (Nadeau and Allen) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09CouncilRetained by the Council
2020-05-26CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 9, 2020
2020-05-19CouncilFinal Reading
2020-05-19CouncilOral Amendments (Mendelson)
2020-05-19CouncilOral Amendment (Nadeau and Allen)
2020-05-18CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback