DC B23-0754 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-754 provides an extension of the real property tax abatement to the 800 Kenilworth Avenue, N.E. redevelopment project, described as Lot 0008 in Square 5058.
Title
800 Kenilworth Avenue Northeast Redevelopment Project Real Property Limited Tax Abatement Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-09-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-08-31 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-05-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0754 Published in the DC Register |
2020-05-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2020-05-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0754 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/44657/Introduction/B23-0754-Introduction.pdf |