DC B23-0744 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Agendized-not considered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Agendized-not considered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Foreclosure Moratorium Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Foreclosure Moratorium Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Council | Agendized-not considered |
2020-05-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0744 Published in the DC Register |
2020-05-05 | Council | First Reading |
2020-05-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-04-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |