DC B23-0731 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Act A23-0298 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5048, Expires on Jul 26, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Act A23-0298 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5048, Expires on Jul 26, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children's Hospital Research and Innovation Campus Equitable Tax Relief Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Children's Hospital Research and Innovation Campus Equitable Tax Relief Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Council | Act A23-0298 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5048, Expires on Jul 26, 2020 |
2020-05-05 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-04-27 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0298, Expires on Jul 26, 2020 |
2020-04-17 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 1, 2020 |
2020-04-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-04-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-04-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |