DC B23-0723 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-15 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-15 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-723 provides definitions for certain terms related to the offense of rioting. It clarifies the conduct that constitutes rioting, revises the penalties for convictions, and establishes a right to a jury trial for prosecutions.
Title
Rioting Modernization Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-08-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-08-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-04-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2020-03-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0723 Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0723 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/44484/Introduction/B23-0723-Introduction.pdf |