DC B23-0703 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Act A23-0289 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5021, Expires on Jul 30, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Contract No. DCAM-19-CS-RFQ-0001A and Modification No. 01 with DC General Construction, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contract No. DCAM-19-CS-RFQ-0001A and Modification No. 01 with DC General Construction, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15CouncilAct A23-0289 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5021, Expires on Jul 30, 2020
2020-05-05CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-05-01CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0289, Expires on Jul 30, 2020
2020-04-17CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 1, 2020
2020-04-07CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-03-17CouncilRetained by the Council
2020-03-02CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback