DC B23-0696 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-17 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-17 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-696 establishes a Limited Equity Cooperative Advisory Council to provide policy recommendations to assist District residents and the District government with improving and establishing limited equity cooperatives.
Title
Limited Equity Cooperative Advisory Council Act of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-17 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-08-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-08-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0696 Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2020-03-03 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0696 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/44333/Introduction/B23-0696-Introduction.pdf |