DC B23-0692 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
Pending: Council Transportation and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-692 prevents car-sharing motor vehicles that are not registered in and do not have contracts with the District from taking advantage of the 60-day exemption from the District's licensure and registration requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rosa Loophole Elimination Amendment Act Of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2020-03-13CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0692 Published in the DC Register
2020-03-06CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-03-03CouncilAgendized - Not Considered
2020-03-03CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback