DC B23-0670 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Law L23-0162, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000736
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Law L23-0162, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000736
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-670 provides that grants available to assist homeowners with the rehabilitation of historic property under the Targeted Homeowner Grant Program may be used to rehabilitate a structure that contributes to the character of the Bloomingdale Historic District.
Title
Bloomingdale Historic District Targeted Historic Preservation Assistance Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-15 | Council | Law L23-0162, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000736 |
2020-11-13 | Council | Act A23-0473 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13261 |
2020-11-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-11-03 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-11-02 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0473 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 3, 2020 |
2020-09-22 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-09-21 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-07-21 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-07-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0670 |
2020-07-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-06-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-06-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-04-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0670 Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |