DC B23-0642 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-31 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-31 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-642 requires the Office of the State Superintendent of Education to develop an African-American history and cultural studies curriculum for high school students enrolled in a District of Columbia Public or Charter School.
Title
African American and Cultural Studies Inclusion Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-31 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-07-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-02-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0642 Published in the DC Register |
2020-02-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-02-04 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0642 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/44109/Introduction/B23-0642-Introduction.pdf |