DC B23-0623 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-623 establishes a time frame and process to resolve warranty claims that arise under the act. It clarifies that the Mayor may refer disputed claims to the Office of Administrative Hearings among other things.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condominium Warranty Claims Clarification Amendment Act Of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-02-28CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-02-04CouncilReferred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization
2020-01-31CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0623 Published in the DC Register
2020-01-22CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback