DC B23-0621 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Act A23-0231 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2510, Expires on May 27, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Act A23-0231 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2510, Expires on May 27, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Condominium Warranty Claims Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Condominium Warranty Claims Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Bonds) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Bonds) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Council | Act A23-0231 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2510, Expires on May 27, 2020 |
2020-02-28 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-02-27 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0231, Expires on May 27, 2020 |
2020-02-14 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 2, 2020 |
2020-02-04 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-02-04 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Bonds) |
2020-02-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-01-22 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |