DC B23-0612 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-14 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-612 would allow OCTO to obtain and expend District, federal, and private grants, and to award grant funds to stimulate, support, and promote the development of innovative technologies in the District. It also grants OCTO authority to protect the District's information technology and telecommunications systems from a range of cybersecurity threats.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Secure, Managed, Responsive, and Trusted Technology (Smart Tech) Amendment Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-14CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-09-18CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-09-18CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-09-14CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-09-11CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-01-24CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0612 Published in the DC Register
2020-01-21CouncilReferred to Committee on Government Operations
2020-01-14CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback