DC B23-0608 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-23 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-608 provides an abatement of property, recordation, and transfer taxes for the real property located at 1001 Spring Road, N.W.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Spring Flats Mixed-Income Family Apartments Real Property Tax Abatement Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-23CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-09-04CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-08-31CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-07-22CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-07-10CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-07-07CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-01-21CouncilReferred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
2020-01-17CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0608 Published in the DC Register
2020-01-10CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback