DC B23-0599 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Act A23-0209 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1100, Expires on Apr 27, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Act A23-0209 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1100, Expires on Apr 27, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children and Youth Vision Screening Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Children and Youth Vision Screening Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Council | Act A23-0209 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1100, Expires on Apr 27, 2020 |
2020-01-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-01-28 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0209, Expires on Apr 27, 2020 |
2020-01-21 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-01-13 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 28, 2020 |
2020-01-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-01-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |