DC B23-0586 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - Law L23-0070, Effective from Mar 19, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4177, Expires on Oct 30, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - Law L23-0070, Effective from Mar 19, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4177, Expires on Oct 30, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Parkside Parcel E and J Mixed-Income Apartments Tax Abatement Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Parkside Parcel E and J Mixed-Income Apartments Tax Abatement Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | Council | Law L23-0070, Effective from Mar 19, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4177, Expires on Oct 30, 2020 |
2020-02-07 | Council | Act A23-0216 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1114 |
2020-02-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-01-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-01-29 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0216 |
2020-01-14 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 29, 2020 |
2020-01-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-01-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-12-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0586 Published in the DC Register |
2019-12-17 | Council | First Reading |
2019-12-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |