DC B23-0582 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 6 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-31 - Act A23-0201 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 731, Expires on Apr 21, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 6 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-31 - Act A23-0201 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 731, Expires on Apr 21, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2020 Budget Support Clarification Second Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Fiscal Year 2020 Budget Support Clarification Second Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-17 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | Council | Act A23-0201 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 731, Expires on Apr 21, 2020 |
2020-01-22 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0201, Expires on Apr 21, 2020 |
2020-01-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-01-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-01-06 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 21, 2020 |
2019-12-17 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-12-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |