DC B23-0579 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-11-24 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-579 requires the Office of the State Superintendent of Education (OSSE) to create and implement a Selective Service awareness campaign. OSSE shall do this in consultation with the District of Columbia Department of Motor Vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Selective Service Federal Benefits Awareness Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-24CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-11-06CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-10-30CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-12-20CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0579 Published in the DC Register
2019-12-17CouncilReferred to Committee on Education
2019-12-13CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback