DC B23-0568 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-568 increases the maximum and minimum amount of down payment assistance for Home Purchase Assistance to $100,000 and $30,000 respectively. It provides a home repair grant of a maximum of $15,000 and removes certain funding limitations for 203K renovation loans among other things.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home Purchase Assistance Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-02-28CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-12-06CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0568 Published in the DC Register
2019-12-03CouncilReferred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization
2019-12-03CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback