DC B23-0561 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-06 - Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0561 Published in the DC Register
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-06 - Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0561 Published in the DC Register
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-561 extends the deadline to September 30, 2020 by which the Department of Energy and Environment must adopt and publish a record of decisions in the District of Columbia Register choosing the remedy for remediation of contaminated sediment in the Anacostia River.
Title
Anacostia River Toxics Remediation Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0561 Published in the DC Register |
2019-12-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2019-11-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0561 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/43668/Introduction/B23-0561-Introduction.pdf |