DC B23-0556 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-03 - Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
Pending: Council Business and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-556 reinstates the Deputy Mayor for Planning and Economic Development's (DMPED) authority to issue grants from the H Street, N.E. Retail Priority Area Grant Fund until September 30, 2020; amends the Creative and Open Space Modernization tax rebate program to allow qualified occupant improvement work to include work done by property owners or landlords of eligible premises; and expands grant-making authority for DMPED to allow grants to the DC Chamber of Commerce.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business Development Omnibus Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-03CouncilReferred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
2019-11-29CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0556 Published in the DC Register
2019-11-22CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback