DC B23-0553 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-03 - Act A23-0180 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1, Expires on Mar 22, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-03 - Act A23-0180 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1, Expires on Mar 22, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With eFunds Corporation
Title
Contract No. CFOPD-11-C-040 Extension Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-03 | Council | Act A23-0180 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1, Expires on Mar 22, 2020 |
2019-12-27 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-12-23 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0180, Expires on Mar 22, 2020 |
2019-12-12 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 27, 2019 |
2019-12-03 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-12-03 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-11-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |