DC B23-0548 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Act A23-0545 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00108
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Act A23-0545 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00108
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-548 provides free fishing licenses to members of the Piscataway Indian Nation and the Piscataway Conoy Tribe.
Title
1666 Articles of Peace and Amity Recognition Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Council | Act A23-0545 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00108 |
2020-12-23 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-12-22 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0545 |
2020-12-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 24, 2020 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-17 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-11-09 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-09 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0548 |
2020-07-30 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-07-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-06-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-06-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0548 Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2019-11-19 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |