DC B23-0547 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-27 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-547 allows birth certificate recognition of Native American tribal enrollment. It allows an individual to request a replacement birth certificate that includes recognition of Native American tribal enrollment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Native American Birth Recognition Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-27CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-01-10CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-12-06CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-11-22CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0547 Published in the DC Register
2019-11-19CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2019-11-19CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback