DC B23-0542 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0489 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13906
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0489 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13906
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-542 would require both subordinate and independent agencies of the District of Columbia to work with the DC Homeland Security and Emergency Management Agency to develop, update, and exercise Continuity of Operations Plans to implement during an emergency event or outage.
Title
District Government Continuity of Operations Plans Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-06 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-06 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Council | Act A23-0489 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13906 |
2020-11-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-11-16 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0489 |
2020-11-02 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 17, 2020 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-10-06 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-09-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-09-24 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0542 |
2020-02-06 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-12-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0542 Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-11-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |