DC B23-0537 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on November 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-537 establishes within the Department of Housing and Community Development a Senior Co-Living Program to provide financial assistance to support senior homeowners to rent spare rooms to other senior residents. Eligibility requirements for homeowners include proof that the applicant is 60 years or older and that the residence is the applicant's primary place of residence and that it is owned by the applicant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senior Co-Living Program Establishment Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-21CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-09-18CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-09-11CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-11-15CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0537 Published in the DC Register
2019-11-05CouncilReferred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization
2019-11-05CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback