DC B23-0535 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 20 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 7, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-535 requires prescription opioid medications to include a statement that the drug is an opioid and that opioids may cause dependence, addiction, or overdose.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opioid Labeling Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-10 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-20CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 7, 2020
2020-11-10CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-10-20CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2020-10-07CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-10-07CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0535
2020-07-29CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-07-10CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-07-06CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-12-06CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-11-15CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0535 Published in the DC Register
2019-11-05CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2019-11-05CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback