DC B23-0527 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Act A23-0177 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16185
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Federal Worker Housing Relief Extension Temporary Amendment Act Of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal Worker Housing Relief Extension Temporary Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-19 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-13CouncilAct A23-0177 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16185
2019-12-12CouncilTransmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is January 21, 2020
2019-12-05CouncilSigned with Act Number A23-0177
2019-12-05CouncilEnacted with Act Number A23-0177
2019-11-25CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 11, 2019
2019-11-19CouncilFinal Reading CC
2019-11-19CouncilRetained by the Council
2019-11-08CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0527 Published in the DC Register
2019-11-05CouncilFirst Reading
2019-11-05CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback