DC B23-0524 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Law L23-0067, Effective from Mar 11, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3450, Expires on Oct 22, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Law L23-0067, Effective from Mar 11, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3450, Expires on Oct 22, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Community Harassment Prevention Second Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Community Harassment Prevention Second Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-19 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Council | Law L23-0067, Effective from Mar 11, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3450, Expires on Oct 22, 2020 |
2019-12-13 | Council | Act A23-0176 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16183 |
2019-12-12 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2019-12-06 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-12-05 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0176 |
2019-11-26 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 12, 2019 |
2019-11-19 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-11-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-11-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0524 Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-05 | Council | First Reading |
2019-11-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |