DC B23-0523 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-29 - Act A23-0168 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 15702, Expires on Feb 23, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-29 - Act A23-0168 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 15702, Expires on Feb 23, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Community Harassment Prevention Second Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Community Harassment Prevention Second Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-29 | Council | Act A23-0168 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 15702, Expires on Feb 23, 2020 |
2019-11-25 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-11-25 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0168, Expires on Feb 23, 2020 |
2019-11-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-11-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 25, 2019 |
2019-11-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-11-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |