DC B23-0515 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-23 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-515 requires the Office of the State Superintendent of Education (OSSE) to publicly report data relevant to understanding teacher retention and attrition and provide an annual report of their findings. Findings shall include school, local education agency, and state level data on why teachers decide to leave the teaching profession as well as report on the use of long-term substitute teachers in schools. It shall also report on unfilled vacancies that remain at the beginning of a school year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statewide Educational Data Warehouse Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-23CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-09-11CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-09-04CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-11-08CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0515 Published in the DC Register
2019-11-05CouncilReferred to Committee on Education
2019-10-25CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback