DC B23-0506 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Act A23-0542 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00068
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-506 requires a plan for comprehensive organics site management and recycling infrastructure. Among other things it requires a uniform recycling labeling scheme, requires waste collectors to address contamination in recyclables and compostables and requires the Mayor to impose a surcharge on recycling disposed of at District transfer stations when they exceed a contamination threshold. It establishes additional standards regarding the use of compostable disposable food service ware such as requiring the use of reusable food service ware when providing food for consumption. It also establishes a reuse and donation program to reduce waste in landfills and incinerators. FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. Please see the Fiscal Impact Statement under Other Documents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Zero Waste Omnibus Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-01CouncilAct A23-0542 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00068
2020-12-23CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-12-22CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0542
2020-12-10CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 24, 2020
2020-12-01CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-11-17CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2020-11-09CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-11-09CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0506
2019-12-16CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-11-29CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-11-22CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-10-25CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0506 Published in the DC Register
2019-10-22CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2019-10-22CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback