DC B23-0500 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-500 would bring the District law into compliance with state law requirements set in the Federal Unemployment Tax Act by expanding the definition of employment and by permitting government entities and instrumentalities to make payments into the District Unemployment Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unemployment Compensation Employer Classification Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-30CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-09-25CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-09-16CouncilOversight Hearing Held
2020-07-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-07-20CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-10-22CouncilReferred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development
2019-10-18CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0500 Published in the DC Register
2019-10-09CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback