DC B23-0494 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-494 bans the use of non-compete provisions in employment agreements and workplace policies. It also protects employees' right to make a complaint or file a court case and it bars employers from retaliating against employees who inquire about their rights. Among other things, it specifies statutory penalties and relief for noncompliance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ban On Non-compete Agreements Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-06CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-10-25CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-10-18CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0494 Published in the DC Register
2019-10-08CouncilReferred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development
2019-10-08CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback