DC B23-0488 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced this bill establishes that expenditures on school-administered theatrical and music performances shall be an allowable expenditure from a school's Student Activity Fund. Theatrical and music performances include the planning, rehearsal, or presentation of a musical, staged play, choral production, orchestral or band concert, variety show, improvised or sketch comedy performance, or other live performance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Activity Fund Theatrical And Music Performance Expenditures Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-01-31CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-01-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-10-18CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0488 Published in the DC Register
2019-10-08CouncilReferred to Committee on Education
2019-10-08CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback